Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Peter Krassner, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Goldstein, Robert B., against David Reid, James Snyder, Mark Ford, represented by Minkoff, Bruce, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts Westchester County Supreme Court with Nicholas Colabella presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 06, 2012 |
CategoryCommercial |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseWestchester County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time133 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 01, 2012ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: August 14, 2012SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 06, 2012ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #001)
Date: August 06, 2012RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: August 06, 2012STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 17, 2012LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 14, 2012LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 20, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
November 01, 2012 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
September 20, 2012 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
August 14, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE entered in the office of the County Clerk on August 14, 2012 | |
August 06, 2012 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | |
August 06, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #001) | |
August 06, 2012 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
August 06, 2012 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - A-C | |
August 06, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.