Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Cosentino, Kelly, Fox, Christine L., Heaney, Alexandra Rose, Polowy, Amy E., Rudroff Lavis, Amanda Carol, (total of 7) See All against Board Of Managers Of Coachlight Square On The Hudson Association, Inc., Capital One Bank Usa Na, Hector Deleon A K A Hector De Leon, Keren V. Deleon A K A Keren V. De Leon, Kerry Deleon, (total of 5) See All represented by Racano, Frank Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts Westchester County Supreme Court with Sam D Walker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSam D Walker Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 17, 2012 |
CategoryForeclosure |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseWestchester County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time2571 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3)
Date: April 18, 2019ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: October 28, 2013ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002)
Date: December 12, 2013LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 22, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 04, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 21, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: January 17, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: April 18, 2019ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #3)
Date: August 01, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 27, 2012ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: August 07, 2013NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: August 07, 2013SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 17, 2012STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 08, 2012LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 24, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: December 12, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #3) | |
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3) | |
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3) | |
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT (Motion #3) | |
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #3) Copy of the re-filed Notice of Pendency |
|
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #3) Copy of the re-filed Notice of Pendency |
|
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) Order appointing the Referee |
|
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Copy of any Notice(s) of Appearance and/or Answer(s) |
|
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Copies of the Summons, Complaint, and Notice of Pendency |
|
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #3) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.