Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Sara S Cavalier, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gash, Gary M, against Kofi Agyemang, Ruby Acheampong And, represented by Seeman, Jeremy Eli, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts with Nancy Quinn Koba presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNancy Quinn Koba Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 20, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: November 27, 2023NOTICE
Date: November 30, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 31, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 31, 2024NOTICE
Date: November 30, 2023ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: November 27, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 26, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 16, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 17, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 17, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 11, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: August 04, 2023STIPULATION - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: August 15, 2023ANSWER
Date: May 11, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Police Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2024 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 31, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Sarah S. Cavalier |
||
December 26, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER mediation opt out order |
||
November 30, 2023 |
NOTICE Mediation Notice |
||
November 30, 2023 |
NOTICE Mediation Attachments |
||
November 27, 2023 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
November 27, 2023 | ORDER - REFERENCE | ||
August 16, 2023 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
August 15, 2023 | STIPULATION - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
August 04, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.