Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Harvey Lannak, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Halpern, Philip M, Hochberg, Shari B., Nicolay, Harry Joseph, against Mercer Consumer, Mercer Health & Benefits Administration Llc, New York Life Insurance Company, represented by Lubarsky, Richard Franklin, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts Westchester County Supreme Court with William J Giacomo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam J Giacomo Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 18, 2019 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseWestchester County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time71 days |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 20, 2019STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 28, 2019STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: July 22, 2019STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: July 24, 2019STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: August 09, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 18, 2019STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: July 03, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | |
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: OTHER Request to "So-Order" Order and Stipulation of Settlement |
|
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Form Releases |
|
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Form Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER as to the Mercer Defendants |
|
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER as to defendant New York Life Insurance Company |
|
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER as to defendant New York Life Insurance Company |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.