Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., As Trustee For Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trust, Series 2004-Opt1, Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sposato, Melissa A., against Banco Popular North America, Ellen Barasch A K A Ellen Crawford Barasch A K A Ellen Crawford, Ellen Barasch A K A Ellen Crawford Barasch A K A Ellen Crawford, John Doe 1 Through 12, John Doe 1 Through 12, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts with Charles D Wood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles D Wood Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 25, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: June 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 25, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: June 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: June 25, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 07, 2021ANSWER
Date: August 01, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 02, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: June 25, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 02, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 24, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: January 24, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 0 Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 24, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: January 24, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: January 24, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISCONTINUE
Date: January 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 13, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 13, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 13, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 07, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 07, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) Proposed Order |
||
March 07, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2) Aff in support of unopposed Cross-Motion |
||
March 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - W (Motion #2) Stip of Adjournemnt on Consent |
||
March 07, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #2) Reply Memo of Law in Support of unopposed Cross-Motion |
||
February 17, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION | ||
February 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) 2009 Foreclosure summons and complaint |
||
February 13, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Aff in support of cross motion |
||
February 13, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #2) memorandum of law in opp, and in support of cross-motion |
||
February 13, 2023 |
NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2) Cross Motion to Consolidate, dismiss with Prejudice and request for Hearing |
||
February 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) 2021 Foreclosure summons and complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.