Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Toki Hall As The Administrator Of The Estate Of Bette Grace, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Marino, Salvatore Louis, against Parkview Operating Co., Llc, represented by Koster, Warren Stephen, Milchan, Michael, Pan, David Tawei, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts with Nancy Quinn Koba presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNancy Quinn Koba Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 27, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Public Health Law) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: January 25, 2024ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: January 26, 2024ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 01, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: October 31, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: October 10, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 06, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: October 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 12, 2023BILL OF PARTICULARS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 05, 2023ANSWER
Date: August 07, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 07, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: August 03, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 07, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2024 | ORDER - REFERENCE | ||
January 25, 2024 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
November 01, 2023 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 31, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
October 10, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 06, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 06, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
October 05, 2023 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
August 07, 2023 |
ANSWER Verified Answer & Initial Demands obo Parkview Operating Co., LLC |
||
August 03, 2023 |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER until 09.01.2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.