Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Ellise L. Lewis, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Abrams, Ari, Niyazov, Arsen Ariel, against Chelsea Taxi, Llc., Larry V. Webb, represented by Moskovits, Ronit Z, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts with _ Pc Part, Pc Part presiding.
Case Number |
Judge_ Pc Part, Pc Part Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 20, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 09, 2024RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 09, 2024COURT NOTICE
Date: January 11, 2024RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 09, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 09, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 09, 2024ANSWER
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 08, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2024 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 09, 2024 | BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
January 09, 2024 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
January 09, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Police Report |
||
January 09, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C HIPAA - Medical Records |
||
January 09, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A HIPAA - No-Fault file |
||
June 28, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND INSURANCE DISCLOSURE |
||
June 28, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
June 28, 2023 |
ANSWER VERIFIED ANSWER, BILL OF PARTICULARS & COMBINED DEMANDS |
||
May 08, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.