Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Westchester County Health Care Corporation, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, Leiderman, Joel D, Watts, Valerie Elizabeth, against Dasia Evans, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts Westchester County Supreme Court with Joan B Lefkowitz presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management517 days |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2016 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions71 days |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseWestchester County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time78 days |
ANSWER
Date: September 05, 2017STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 06, 2018JUDGMENT
Date: August 17, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 11, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 28, 2016REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: September 15, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 28, 2017RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: April 20, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: April 20, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 31, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2018 | Hearing |
Discontinued Parris, Colette M. - Compliance Conference Part SOD OR APPEAR |
|
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE |
|
February 28, 2018 | Hearing |
Continued Parris, Colette M. - Compliance Conference Part |
|
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
October 30, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Preliminary Conference Part |
|
September 18, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned Preliminary Conference Part |
|
September 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) RPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM |
|
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
May 19, 2017 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Hon. Joan Lefkowitz Motions Judge: Lefkowitz, Hon. Joan B. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.