Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Westchester County Health Care Corporation, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Fjermedal, Glenn Michael, Garbus, Mark A, Leiderman, Joel D, Watts, Valerie Elizabeth, against Anthony Bazzo, represented by Grace, Michael J, Grace, William J., in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts Westchester County Supreme Court with Joan B presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management307 days |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2016 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions948 days |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseWestchester County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time975 days |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: September 09, 2016STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: November 01, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #1)
Date: February 14, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: January 10, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: November 29, 2017ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #1)
Date: January 05, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #1)
Date: November 29, 2017ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: December 27, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #1)
Date: January 16, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 27, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 19, 2017ANSWER
Date: July 08, 2016INTERROGATORIES
Date: September 28, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 31, 2016STIPULATION - TRIAL READINESS
Date: November 03, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: January 08, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: February 09, 2018LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 16, 2018ORDER - TRIAL READINESS
Date: October 24, 2017ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: October 30, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #1)
Date: January 12, 2018JUDGMENT
Date: January 31, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 28, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | |
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE | |
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | |
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
DECISION/ORDER AFTER HEARING Decision and Order after Trial |
|
December 04, 2018 | Hearing |
Verdict
Judge: Loehr, Hon. Gerald E. |
|
July 19, 2018 | Hearing |
Decision Reserved Parties are to submit their proposed FINDINGS OF FACT by Thursday, 19 July 2018. An e-mail via NYSCEF is also being sent to inform the parties of the 19 JULY '18 submission date, as well. Judge: Loehr, Hon. Gerald E. |
|
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event | TRIAL MEMORANDUM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.