Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Katilia Lopez, Rosa Margolla Rivera, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Asch, Ian Harris, Campson, Paul J, Paulstich, David E, Stein, Joshua Neil, against Jennifer Medina Luquis, represented by Scahill, Francis J, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts with Nancy Quinn Koba presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNancy Quinn Koba Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 02, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: January 24, 2024ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: October 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 20, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: April 19, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 02, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 20, 2023ANSWER
Date: March 23, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: March 31, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)
Date: March 22, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE COMPLIANCE PURSUANT TO CPLR 306-C Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 09, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: April 19, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 31, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: April 13, 2023ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: August 01, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 04, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: July 31, 2023BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: August 07, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 23, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 07, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: September 07, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 10, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 21, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2024 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
October 25, 2023 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
October 23, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Defendant's Post Deposition Demand |
||
September 21, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Further Demand for Discovery |
||
September 21, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Supplemental Response to Demand for Photos |
||
September 07, 2023 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
August 10, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Def Response to Pltf Lopez Demands |
||
August 07, 2023 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS BP PACKAGE AND REPLY FOR D&I |
||
August 07, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 04, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Defendant's Demands and CC Order dated 07/31/2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.