Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Revalc Llc, filed a(n) Unfair Competition - Antitrust case represented by Davis, Jeffrey K, against Jon Verazza, La Bottega, Maria Boccasini, represented by Capone, Lisa Marie, Curto, Michael Joseph, Weinstein, Fred D, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts Westchester County Supreme Court with Alan Scheinkman presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 16, 2016 |
CategoryCommercial Division (Unfair Competition) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaAntitrust |
|
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeUnfair Competition |
|
Filing Court HouseWestchester County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time319 days |
RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 16, 2016STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 08, 2017JOINT ONE PAGE STATEMENT OF FACTS & PARTIES CONTENTIONS
Date: November 04, 2016STIPULATION - OTHER (Motion #003)
Date: August 29, 2016LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 17, 2017ANSWER
Date: September 26, 2016ANSWER
Date: October 03, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: May 26, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: July 06, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: July 06, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 14, 2017STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: October 18, 2016LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 03, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #003)
Date: August 04, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: August 04, 2016MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)
Date: July 06, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT (FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID)
Date: June 20, 2016MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #001)
Date: May 24, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: May 24, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: May 24, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: May 24, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: May 16, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 16, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2017 | Hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) Alan D. Scheinkman Judge: Scheinkman, Hon. Alan D. |
|
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT entered in the office of the County Clerk on January 17, 2017 | |
January 14, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
November 04, 2016 | Docket Event | JOINT ONE PAGE STATEMENT OF FACTS & PARTIES CONTENTIONS | |
October 21, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE entered in the office of the County Clerk on October 21, 2016 | |
October 20, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned Alan D. Scheinkman Judge: Scheinkman, Hon. Alan D. |
|
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation to adjourn 10/20 conference |
|
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Answer with Affidavit of Service | |
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT entered in the office of the County Clerk on October 03, 2016 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.