Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Susan Sullivan, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Delgado, Gamaliel Benjamin, against Petsmart Llc, represented by Rubine, Seth Brian, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts with Paul I Marx presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul I Marx Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 13, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises Liability) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
COURT NOTICE
Date: July 21, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 06, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 05, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 22, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: November 09, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 06, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: May 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 10, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 13, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: November 15, 2023STIPULATION - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: June 02, 2023ANSWER
Date: April 12, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: August 11, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 24, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: July 14, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2023 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
November 09, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 11, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 24, 2023 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Preliminary Conference Stipulation |
||
July 21, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 14, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
June 06, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Authorizations |
||
June 06, 2023 | Affidavit of Service for Demand for Authorizations | ||
June 05, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Plaintiff's Demand for Bill of Particulars as to Affirmative Defenses, and Plaintiff's Combined Disc Plaintiff's Demand for Bill of Particulars as to Affirmative Defenses, and Plaintiff's Combined Disc ... show more |
||
June 05, 2023 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.