Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc D B A Mr. Cooper, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Caster, Austin Robert, Gazzo, Nicole Carol, against Barbara A. Desouza, John P. Desouza, Leah D. Clinton, Westchester County Clerk, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts with Janet C Malone presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Contract (Non-Commercial)) |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 27, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 24, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 27, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 27, 2023AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY
Date: June 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 27, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 15, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: September 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 27, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 28, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
June 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service |
||
June 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint |
||
June 27, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
June 27, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
June 27, 2023 | AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY | ||
June 27, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Affidavit of Yolanda Shavers |
||
June 27, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.