Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Xxxxx Xxxxxxxxx, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Bruggemann, Atty Kathleen, Dimopoulos, Constantine G, Rohani, Samae, against Deanna E Barenboim, represented by Kellman, Nancy D., Stack, Jane Marie, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts Westchester County Supreme Court with Kathie Davidson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathie Davidson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 18, 2018 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedApril 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseWestchester County Supreme Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2021 | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER | ||
June 28, 2021 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
June 22, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
June 21, 2021 | Motion |
Qualified Domestic Relations Order (Motion #003) Decided: 03/11/2021Granted Before Justice: Davidson, Hon. Kathie E. Answer demanded: No Judge: Davidson, Hon. Kathie E. |
|
June 21, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
June 21, 2021 | QUALIFIED MEDICAL CHILD SUPPORT ORDER | ||
June 21, 2021 | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
June 21, 2021 | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER | ||
June 11, 2021 | Motion |
Qualified Domestic Relations Order (Motion #002) Decided: 03/11/2021Granted Before Justice: Davidson, Hon. Kathie E. Answer demanded: No Judge: Davidson, Hon. Kathie E. |
|
June 11, 2021 | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.