Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Wilmington Savings Fund Society Fsb D B A Christiana Trust As Trustee For Pnpms Trust Ii, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Frank, Thomas J., Manfredi, Linda P., against Doreen Henneberry, John Doe 1 Through John Doe 10, Said Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, Intended To Be Possible Tenants Or Occupants Of The Premises, Or Corporations, Persons, Or Other Entities Having Or Claiming A Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises, John Henneberry, represented by Nelson, Carl James, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts with _ D Foreclosure Ju presiding.
Case Number |
Judge_ D Foreclosure Ju Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
COURT NOTICE
Date: January 10, 2024FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM
Date: November 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 23, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: January 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 23, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: January 23, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: January 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: January 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 23, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 17, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 17, 2023NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: May 18, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 17, 2023NOTICE
Date: October 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 17, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: October 17, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: October 19, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: October 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 07, 2023ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 12, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 17, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 07, 2023REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: May 02, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2024 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 21, 2023 | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM | ||
October 20, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 19, 2023 |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorney |
||
October 18, 2023 | NOTICE | ||
October 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) 2023 Summons and Compaint with Exhibits |
||
October 17, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Defendant's Brief in Support of Motion to Dismis |
||
October 17, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation |
||
October 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) 2011 Summons and Complaint |
||
October 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) 2011 Affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.