Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
John P Dhuman, Rajcoomar Chandrapaul, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Surf Club On The Sound, represented by Calandriello, Amedeo, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts with Paul I Marx presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul I Marx Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 16, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 16, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: July 11, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: November 21, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 07, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: May 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 07, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: June 12, 2023NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: May 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 07, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 22, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 22, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 19, 2022ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST
Date: March 15, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: March 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: October 28, 2022ANSWER
Date: September 28, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 15, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 24, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: March 17, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 30, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 25, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: December 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: December 09, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 11, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
June 22, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER Presumptive ADR Stipulation and Order of Reference |
||
June 21, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
June 12, 2023 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
June 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Emails |
||
June 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Recordings |
||
June 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Contract |
||
May 19, 2023 | NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION | ||
May 17, 2023 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - WJG Part |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.