Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Attorney For Child, Liliana Grados, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Epstein, Laurie C., against Enrique Grados, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts with John P Colangelo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 19, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 21, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 20, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
January 20, 2022 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | ||
December 22, 2021 | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE | ||
December 22, 2021 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
December 22, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
December 16, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
November 23, 2021 | MOTION PAPERS W/EXHIBITS (PRIOR TO CONVERSION) | ||
November 23, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.