Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Neicida Armand, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Zafonte, Albert Anthony, against Steven A Lawrence, The City Of Mount Vernon, represented by Powell, Johan S., in the jurisdiction of Westchester County, NY, . Westchester County, NY Superior Courts with Lewis Jay Lubell presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 12, 2019COURT NOTICE
Date: October 15, 2019ORDER - TRIAL READINESS
Date: April 28, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: March 04, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: September 26, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 01, 2021ANSWER
Date: March 13, 2019PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: September 26, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 21, 2019ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: March 12, 2020STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE
Date: February 28, 2020RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 26, 2019COURT NOTICE
Date: October 02, 2019STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 11, 2022ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: March 12, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 26, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 31, 2019NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: May 06, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: September 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2022 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
September 02, 2021 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS Supplemental Verified Bill of Particulars with attachments and affidavit of mailing |
||
September 01, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE settlement conference form |
||
May 06, 2021 |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY Note of Issue with Certificate of Readiness & Order |
||
April 28, 2021 | ORDER - TRIAL READINESS | ||
March 04, 2021 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
March 12, 2020 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE entered in the office of the County Clerk on March 12, 2020 | ||
March 12, 2020 | ORDER - REFERENCE entered in the office of the County Clerk on March 12, 2020 | ||
February 28, 2020 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE Stipulation to adjourn conference |
||
November 12, 2019 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.