Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Us Bank N A As Trustee For Gsaa Home Equity Trust 2006-5 Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2006-5, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against Amy Salerno, Brian Salerno, Estate Of Robert M Salerno, Janet Smith, John Doe, (total of 15) See All in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts with Joan B Lefkowitz presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 28, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 10, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 28, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 25, 2020CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: October 28, 2020NOTICE
Date: June 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 10, 2020NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: January 14, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 25, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 27, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 10, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 28, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 14, 2022COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: October 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 14, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: October 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 06, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 27, 2021ORDER - APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: February 28, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: July 01, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 14, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 06, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: May 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 06, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 14, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: July 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: August 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 14, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022HARDSHIP DECLARATION RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE)
Date: March 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: May 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 06, 2022ANSWER
Date: July 01, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022BILL OF COSTS Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - AA Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Z Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - W1 Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Y Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - V1 Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #9)
Date: September 29, 2022JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: November 17, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: February 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 17, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
November 17, 2022 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | ||
October 04, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service |
||
September 29, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #9) Attorney Affirmation in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Confirming Referee Report and Jud Attorney Affirmation in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Confirming Referee Report and Jud ... show more |
||
September 29, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #9) Certificate of Merit |
||
September 29, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION Westchester Law Journal |
||
September 29, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #9) Department of Defense Search results |
||
September 29, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #9) Notice of Default |
||
September 29, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #9) Assignments |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.