Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts with Nicholas Colabella presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management15 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2018 |
CategoryTort-Medical, Dental, Or Podiatric Malpractice |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Case Cycle Time1526 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2020 | Hearing |
Granted (Motion #0016) Settlement Conference Part ICO/OSC File Docs Due - No appearances |
|
June 18, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #0016) Settlement Conference Part ICO/OSC File AOS, Medicaid Lien Letters and Docs Due - No appearances |
|
June 17, 2020 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #0017)
Judge: Ruderman, Hon. Terry Jane |
|
May 20, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #0017)
Judge: Ruderman, Hon. Terry Jane |
|
May 07, 2020 | Motion |
Judgment - Declaratory (Motion #0017) Decided: 06/29/2020Denied Before Justice: Ruderman, Hon. Terry Jane Answer demanded: No Judge: Ruderman, Hon. Terry Jane |
|
March 26, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #0016) Settlement Conference Part ICO/OSC return date. File lien letters & Docs Due. No appearances required |
|
March 12, 2020 | Hearing |
Verdict Trial Ready Part Judge: Ruderman, Hon. Terry Jane |
|
March 11, 2020 | Hearing |
Continued Trial Ready Part Judge: Ruderman, Hon. Terry Jane |
|
March 10, 2020 | Hearing |
Continued Trial Ready Part Judge: Ruderman, Hon. Terry Jane |
|
March 09, 2020 | Hearing |
Continued Trial Ready Part Judge: Ruderman, Hon. Terry Jane |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.