Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Thomas Gleason, filed a(n) case represented by Poray, Stephanie, against Lisa Gleason, in the jurisdiction of Wayne County, NY, . Wayne County, NY Superior Courts with John B. Nesbitt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationWayne County, NY |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 20, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 19, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
January 19, 2022 | REFEREE REPORT - ATTORNEY | ||
January 19, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
December 29, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
December 27, 2021 | PART 130 CERTIFICATION | ||
December 27, 2021 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
December 27, 2021 | AFFIRMATION (AFFIDAVIT) OF REGULARITY | ||
December 22, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.