Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Carrington Mortgage Services, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Nierer, Cynthia Anne, against Jane Does Said Names Being Fictitious, Parties Intended Being Possible Tenants Or Occupants Of Premises, And Corporations, Other Entities Or Persons Who Claim, Or May Claim, A Lien Against The Premises, John Does, Shelby R. Fisher, The People Of The State Of New York, in the jurisdiction of Wayne County, NY, . Wayne County, NY Superior Courts with Richard Healy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 14, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWayne County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: November 14, 2023FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM
Date: November 14, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 10, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: June 14, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 14, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 14, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 02, 2023RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: October 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 15, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: October 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2023 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
November 14, 2023 | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM | ||
October 10, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
October 02, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 02, 2023 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
October 02, 2023 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
August 15, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SHELBY R. FISHER |
||
August 15, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SHELBY R. FISHER 3215 |
||
August 09, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE NAME UNKNOWN SHA JOHN DOE |
||
August 09, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE NAME UNKNOWN SHA JOHN DOE MAILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.