Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cbc Settlement Funding Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Brandimarte, Luigi, against American Home Assurance Company, C S, United States Life Insurance Company In The City Of New York, in the jurisdiction of Wayne County, NY, . Wayne County, NY Superior Courts with John Nesbitt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Sale/Transfer) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWayne County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: January 27, 2022RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 27, 2022NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 10, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: February 07, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: February 03, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: February 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: January 27, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)
Date: January 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 27, 2022PETITION
Date: January 27, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2022 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
February 10, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 08, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
February 07, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
February 03, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED | ||
January 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E IPA |
||
January 27, 2022 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
January 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Disclosure Statement |
||
January 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Purchase and Sale Agreement |
||
January 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Payee's Affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.