Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Andrew Mccann, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Abbott, Jason E., against Carrols Corporation, represented by Norfleet, Kristin Lewis, in the jurisdiction of Wayne County, NY, . Wayne County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Pi - Slip &Amp; Fall) |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWayne County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 24, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 29, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 15, 2021ANSWER
Date: November 29, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: June 29, 2023STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION
Date: December 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
December 08, 2021 | STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION | ||
November 29, 2021 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION | ||
November 29, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
September 15, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 24, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.