Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
County Of Wayne, Daniel C Connors, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case against Civil Service Employees Association, Inc Local 1000, Afsme, Afl-Cio, Local 859, Csea Unit 9100-02, Karen Spotford, in the jurisdiction of Wayne County, NY, . Wayne County, NY Superior Courts with Richard Healy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 19, 2021 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 75 |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationWayne County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
PETITION
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Grievance Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: April 19, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: April 19, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 11, 2021NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: April 19, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: April 22, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
June 15, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 11, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
June 09, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
April 22, 2021 |
RJI -RE: OTHER RJI, CPLR ARTICLE 75 |
||
April 19, 2021 | Petition | ||
April 19, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Arbitration Request |
||
April 19, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A CSEA Contract |
||
April 19, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Letter - June 24, 2019 |
||
April 19, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Grievance Redacted per 22 NYCRR Grievance Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.