Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Scully, James Paul, against Joshua Ferge, in the jurisdiction of Wayne County, NY, . Wayne County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 26, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWayne County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 26, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: August 20, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: August 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 23, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: August 24, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 26, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: August 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: August 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2021 | JUDGMENT - DAMAGES$ COST$ TOTAL$ | ||
August 23, 2021 | Affidavit of Facts and Sale of Account by Citibank, N.A. (Debt Buyer Actions) | ||
August 23, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Invoice for Service |
||
August 20, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
August 20, 2021 | Affirmation of Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations | ||
August 20, 2021 | Affidavit of Facts and Sale of Account by Original Creditor | ||
August 20, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Non-Military Affirmation |
||
April 26, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 26, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 26, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.