Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hughes, Adam Michael, against Joseph P Eichas, in the jurisdiction of Wayne County, NY, . Wayne County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWayne County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 06, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: March 22, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 15, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: April 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: April 08, 2021NOTICE OF REJECTION
Date: March 16, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: April 08, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: April 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2021 | JUDGMENT - DAMAGES$ COST$ TOTAL$ | ||
April 08, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
April 08, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
April 08, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
April 08, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
March 22, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 dmv abstract |
||
March 16, 2021 | NOTICE OF REJECTION | ||
February 15, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 15, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 06, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.