Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Wayne County, NY, . Wayne County, NY Superior Courts with HON. DANIEL G. BARRETT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. DANIEL G. BARRETT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2017 |
CategoryRes. Foreclosure Conf Eligible |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWayne County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time107 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2017 | Hearing |
PRE-DISCONTINUED BARRETT (Court Activity) Judge: HON. DANIEL G. BARRETT |
|
April 19, 2017 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) BARRETT (Motion Part) Judge: HON. DANIEL G. BARRETT |
|
April 19, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) BARRETT (Motion Part) Judge: HON. DANIEL G. BARRETT |
|
March 03, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) BARRETT (Motion Part) Judge: HON. DANIEL G. BARRETT |
|
March 03, 2017 | Motion |
DISCON.ACTION (Motion #001) Decided: 04/19/2017GRANTED Before Justice: HON. DANIEL G. BARRETT Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. DANIEL G. BARRETT |
|
January 03, 2017 | Hearing |
DISCONTINUED BARRETT (Settlement Conference) Judge: HON. DANIEL G. BARRETT |
|
January 03, 2017 | Hearing |
HEARING HELD BARRETT (Hearing) Judge: HON. DANIEL G. BARRETT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.