Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
George G. Gellert, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Otsc With Petition) case represented by Harwick, John F, against Boardwalk Horse Farms Llc, Jeff Vroman, Kiersten Vroman, Nicholas Cutro Jr, Vertical Farms Equine Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Heller, Justin A, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts with Robert J Muller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert J Muller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Otsc With Petition) |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
|
PETITION *Corrected*
Date: September 21, 2022RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 21, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 21, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 23, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 14, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 28, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 23, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
February 23, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
February 02, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
October 14, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit in Opposition |
||
October 14, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Ex. A - Deed |
||
October 13, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service (2) - OTSC with Petition |
||
September 28, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service - OTSC with Petition |
||
September 23, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
September 23, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
September 21, 2022 |
PETITION *Corrected* Turnover Petition with Exhibits (a) through (c) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.