Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Gazzo, Nicole Carol, Goldberg, Brian David, Pascuzzi, Ashley Marie, Polowy, Amy E., against John Doe, Laurie J. Mccullen, Scott P. Mccullen, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts with Kathleen B. Hogan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathleen B. Hogan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 08, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 08, 2022CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 08, 2022RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: November 03, 2022ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: November 03, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: November 04, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 01, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 01, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: November 04, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 01, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: December 07, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: December 07, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: December 08, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: December 09, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: December 09, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: December 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
December 09, 2022 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
December 08, 2022 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
December 08, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
December 07, 2022 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
December 07, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 04, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 04, 2022 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
November 03, 2022 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
November 03, 2022 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.