Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stiller, Craig Scott, Winograd, Ian Zev, against Henry Forrest Aka Henry R Forrest Jr, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts with Robert J Muller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert J Muller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 27, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 27, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: January 03, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: January 03, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 03, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 03, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 20, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: January 03, 2023ANSWER
Date: November 01, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 27, 2022AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: January 03, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 03, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 04, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2023 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION | ||
January 03, 2023 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
January 03, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 03, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) ANSWER |
||
January 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT |
||
January 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) INTERROGATORIES |
||
January 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) DEFAULT LTR ON INTERROGATORIES |
||
January 03, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
January 03, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.