Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Napa, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dept. Of Child Support Services, against Cardenas, Francisco, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2006 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Cycle Time341 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Dismissal 933910-Dismissal Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service DISMISSAL [933910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service PROOF OF SERVICE [912310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Dec 3 2007 Type: 943410 - Dismissal: Other Manner : 941110 - Before Hearing |
|
August 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order 914210-Order Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service ORDER [914210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
February 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff PROOF OF SERVICE [912310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
December 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint DCSS DCSS (Paternity) - Complaint - Dispo Date: 12/03/2007- Disposition Type:Dismissal: Other; MannerBefore Hearing |
|
December 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued and Filed 922120-Summons: Filed Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff SUMMONS: FILED [922120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
December 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed 912410-Complaint Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff COMPLAINT [912410] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.