Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank, National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Di Caro, John A, against A K A Amber Zeno Gentry, Amber R. Gentry Zeno A K A Amber Zeno Gentry, Amber Zeno Gentry Aka, Corporations Or Entities, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest Or Lien Upon Th, John Doe, Said Name Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Des, (total of 6) See All represented by Spina, Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts with Kathleen B. Hogan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathleen B. Hogan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 04, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 04, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 15, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 05, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: March 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 26, 2022SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: October 18, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: June 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 05, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 26, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 26, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 05, 2021BILL OF COSTS Â (Motion #2) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 20, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: February 26, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: May 24, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 15, 2020JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 13, 2022COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 18, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 24, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 24, 2022REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: September 22, 2022FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: September 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2) 90 Day Notices Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 05, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: March 04, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 24, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1) Inspection Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 05, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: May 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2) Demand Letters Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2) Affidavit of Merit Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 26, 2022FORECLOSURE -SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INELIGIBLE AFFIRMATION
Date: February 26, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: May 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 26, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: June 10, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 26, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2022 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
September 22, 2022 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
May 24, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
May 24, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY for JFS |
||
May 24, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for NOE for JFS |
||
May 24, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Notice of Sale |
||
April 13, 2022 |
JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE (Motion #2) Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale |
||
February 26, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Military Status Affidavit |
||
February 26, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service by Mail |
||
February 26, 2022 |
JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #2) Proposed Expedited Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale on Vacant and Abandoned Property |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.