Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
American Advisors Group, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against 1-John Doe 12 The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff,Th, A K A Dorothy H. Labarge, As Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of David E. Laba, Dorothy Labarge A K A Dorothy H. Labarge, As Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of David E. Labarge, Heirs And Distributees Of The Estate Of David E. Labarge, John Doe 1-John Doe 12 The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff,The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corps, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises, Described In The Complaint, (total of 9) See All represented by Burkett, James Robert, Reynolds, Ransom Pratt, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 09, 2021ANSWER
Date: November 08, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: September 09, 2021STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY (PRE-RJI)
Date: June 08, 2022SUMMONS & COMPLAINT W/PROOF OF SVC OF HARDSHIP DECL. & AFF. STATING NO RECEIPT OF HARDSHIP DECL.
Date: September 09, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: September 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 28, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 28, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: April 21, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: June 08, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2022 | STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY (PRE-RJI) | ||
June 08, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
April 21, 2022 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
December 28, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ DOROTHY LABARGE A/K/A DOROTHY H. LABARGE, AS ADMINISTRATRIX, HEIR AND DISTRIBU AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ DOROTHY LABARGE A/K/A DOROTHY H. LABARGE, AS ADMINISTRATRIX, HEIR AND DISTRIBU ... show more |
||
December 28, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE-3215/ DOROTHY LABARGE A/K/A DOROTHY H. LABARGE, AS ADMINISTRATRIX, HEIR AND AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE-3215/ DOROTHY LABARGE A/K/A DOROTHY H. LABARGE, AS ADMINISTRATRIX, HEIR AND ... show more |
||
December 28, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled 3215 Mailing Affidavit-DOROTHY LABARGE A/K/A DOROTHY H. LABARGE, AS ADMINISTRATRIX, HEIR AND Unfiled 3215 Mailing Affidavit-DOROTHY LABARGE A/K/A DOROTHY H. LABARGE, AS ADMINISTRATRIX, HEIR AND ... show more |
||
December 28, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-DOROTHY LABARGE A/K/A DOROTHY H. LABARGE, AS ADMINISTRATRIX, HEIR AND D Unfiled Affidavit of Service-DOROTHY LABARGE A/K/A DOROTHY H. LABARGE, AS ADMINISTRATRIX, HEIR AND D ... show more |
||
November 08, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
October 25, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled 3215 Mailing Affidavit-DOROTHY LABARGE A/K/A DOROTHY H. LABARGE, AS HEIR AND DISTRIBUTEE OF Unfiled 3215 Mailing Affidavit-DOROTHY LABARGE A/K/A DOROTHY H. LABARGE, AS HEIR AND DISTRIBUTEE OF ... show more |
||
October 22, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-DOROTHY LABARGE A/K/A DOROTHY H. LABARGE, AS HEIR AND DISTRIBUTEE OF TH Unfiled Affidavit of Service-DOROTHY LABARGE A/K/A DOROTHY H. LABARGE, AS HEIR AND DISTRIBUTEE OF TH ... show more |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.