Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Amber Beavers, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Vinson, Jessica Hugabone, against Jennifer Beavers, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts with Kelly S Mckeighan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKelly S Mckeighan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2021 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
March 02, 2021 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
March 01, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
March 01, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
February 26, 2021 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
February 26, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
February 19, 2021 | PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
February 17, 2021 | RJI (AMENDED) (Motion #1) | ||
February 12, 2021 | RJI -RE: UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL ACTION | ||
February 12, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.