Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Capital Communications Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Barringer, Jason Dennis, Ruuska, Ryan E, against Andrea E. Celli, Esq. Solely As Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Trustee, John Doe #1-#50 And Mary Roe #1-#50, The Last Two Names Being Fictitious, It Bei, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, William B Broderick, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts with Robert J Muller presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 29, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 11, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: September 29, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1) Notice of Default Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1) Filed Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1) State Confirmation Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 11, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: July 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020HARDSHIP DECLARATION - PROOF OF SERVICE AND AFFIDAVIT ATTESTING NO RECEIPT
Date: May 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 06, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 11, 2021NOTICE TO DEFENDANT (PER AO-131-20)
Date: September 29, 2020CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: September 29, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 06, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 23, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 11, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: August 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 21, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 21, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 11, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 11, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: July 28, 2021ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: June 11, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1) 1303, 1306 Compliance Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 11, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: June 14, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 13, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: June 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1) SCRA/DOD Certificate Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: December 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 27, 2021ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 28, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: August 18, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 11, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISCONTINUE
Date: October 21, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 13, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 28, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
December 28, 2021 | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
October 27, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service with letter |
||
October 21, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Withdrawal Letter |
||
October 21, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 21, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation in Support of Discontinuance & CLP |
||
October 21, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Bankruptcy Order |
||
October 21, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISCONTINUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.