Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Amanda D Heuser, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Martin, Trinidad Martinez, against Carl M Heuser, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts with Adam D Michelini presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAdam D Michelini Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2020 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedApril 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 21, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION - SIGNED |
||
December 21, 2020 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
December 11, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDGES FILES |
||
December 10, 2020 | UCS - 111 | ||
December 10, 2020 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
December 10, 2020 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
December 10, 2020 | Hearing |
POST-JUDGEMENT MICHELINI (Court Activity) Judge: HON. ADAM D. MICHELINI |
|
December 09, 2020 | MATRIMONIAL ADDENDUM (840M) | ||
December 09, 2020 | RJI -RE: UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL ACTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.