Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
U.S. Bank National Association As Indenture Trustee On Behalf Of And With Respec, Us. Bank National Association As Indenture Trustee On Behalf Of And With Respec, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Black, Nicole M, Levine, Deborah Ann, Nardolillo, Michael William, Vartolo, Ralph Lawrence, against A K A Theresa Baurle, Donald E Baurle Jr, John And Jane Doe, Lvnv Funding Llc, Theresa A Baurle A K A Theresa Baurle, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts with Robert J Muller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert J Muller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Assignment of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 04, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Assignments of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G 2017 Loan Modification Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 04, 2020ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: October 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I 90 Day Notice Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 04, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Assignment of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 04, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F 2016 Loan Modification Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Loan Modification Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 04, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 04, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #1) Matrimonial Judgment
Date: May 02, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 02, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: December 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 02, 2022CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: September 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Notice of Default Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 04, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 17, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 24, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 24, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 24, 2020NOTICE TO DEFENDANT (PER AO-131-20)
Date: September 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Proof of Filing Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 04, 2020NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: September 04, 2020CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: September 04, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 24, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 07, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 24, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 24, 2020ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: October 07, 2020RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: October 07, 2020ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: October 27, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: November 03, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: October 14, 2020COURT NOTICE
Date: October 08, 2020COURT NOTICE
Date: December 04, 2020COURT NOTICE
Date: October 27, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: December 08, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: November 03, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: January 20, 2022ORDER - POOR PERSON
Date: January 20, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: December 09, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: December 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 02, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 20, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1) Assignments of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1) Assignment of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1) Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 02, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: December 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1) Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 02, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: March 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 02, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 02, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: March 17, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: October 14, 2020ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: December 04, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 18, 2021HARDSHIP DECLARATION
Date: March 15, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: September 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1) Notice of Default Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #1) SCRA Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 02, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: September 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #1) 1306 POF Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1) Assignments of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 02, 2022ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE
Date: January 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 06, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing |
||
January 06, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry |
||
January 03, 2023 | ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE | ||
December 30, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
May 02, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing Notice of Motion for Order of Reference |
||
May 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion #1) Matrimonial Judgment Matrimonial Judgment Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
May 02, 2022 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Order of Reference and Default Judgment |
||
May 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #1) Affidavit in Support of OREF |
||
May 02, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Default Judgment and Order of Reference |
||
May 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Assignments of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR Assignments of Mortgage Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.