Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Brian Ingerson, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Brennan, Joseph R, against Mary E. Coombs, represented by Winn, John Romayne, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts with Kathleen B. Hogan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathleen B. Hogan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 24, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Partition &Amp; Sale Of Prop.) |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
ANSWER
Date: July 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 02, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: July 18, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 02, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 02, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: June 03, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: June 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 02, 2022NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: July 18, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: September 29, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: June 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 02, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: December 15, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 29, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 29, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 24, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Combined Discovery Demands |
||
December 29, 2022 | Response to Demand for Discovery and Inspection | ||
December 15, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Letter Order |
||
September 29, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Letter Order |
||
June 03, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
June 03, 2022 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
June 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Bank statement 8/1/17 to 8/31/17 |
||
June 02, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
June 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Deed dated 8/23/17 Putorti to Coombs |
||
June 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Taxt messages |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.