Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Janet Ives, Jeremy Ives, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 02, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 18, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 18, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 17, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: January 29, 2021ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: January 29, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 16, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 08, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 28, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: January 28, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: March 22, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: January 28, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 02, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
January 29, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
January 29, 2021 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
January 28, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS R&R FILE # 1336131 | ||
January 28, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1336131 |
||
January 28, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1336131 |
||
July 17, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFF OF MAILING/2ND NOTICE LETTER |
||
July 08, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 16, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING |
||
March 18, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.