Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee For First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-Ff8, Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-Ff8, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by May, Ted E, against Cynthia M. Whitt, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #12, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Robert J. Muller presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 18, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time164 days |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-FF8, against Cynthia M. Whitt and John Doe. The basis of venue is the location of the subject premises. The d...
STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: October 15, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 18, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 15, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 03, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 03, 2018AFFIRMATION
Date: October 15, 2018ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: July 17, 2018AFFIRMATION
Date: October 15, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 10, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 10, 2018AFFIRMATION
Date: July 11, 2018RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 11, 2018COURT NOTICE
Date: July 17, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 10, 2018ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: July 11, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 11, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 10, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 03, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 18, 2018NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: June 18, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 03, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 03, 2018CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: June 18, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 18, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2018 | Hearing |
PRE-SETTLED MULLER (Court Activity) Judge: HON. ROBERT J. MULLER |
|
November 07, 2018 | Hearing |
SETTLED: LOAN MODIFICATION
Judge: JAMES E. DOERN, ESQ |
|
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY | |
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AOS |
|
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION Attorney Affirmation |
|
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Affirmation Discontinuing Action | |
September 26, 2018 | Hearing |
CONTINUED
Judge: JAMES E. DOERN, ESQ |
|
August 08, 2018 | Hearing |
CONTINUED
Judge: JAMES E. DOERN, ESQ |
|
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | |
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.