Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Donna L Covell, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NY, . Warren County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 20, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWarren County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
AFFIRMATION
Date: October 25, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: October 25, 2023JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: October 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 25, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: October 26, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: October 25, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 25, 2023202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: August 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Redacted Charge Off Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 20, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 21, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 25, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION SIGNED PJTAFF |
||
October 25, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION SIGNED NON-SOL |
||
October 25, 2023 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SIGNED DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
||
October 25, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS |
||
October 25, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION MILITARY |
||
October 25, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT AOF |
||
August 29, 2023 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
August 21, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 21, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.