Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Sidney Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shaw, Amanda C, against Joseph Dodge, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NY, . Warren County, NY Superior Courts with Martin D Auffredou presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 11, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWarren County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 27, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: July 19, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: December 11, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: November 27, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 30, 2023RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: November 27, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: November 27, 2023AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 27, 2023JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: December 11, 2023202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: August 22, 2023EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: November 27, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 19, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 11, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 11, 2023 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
November 30, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
November 27, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing a Copy of the Summons |
||
November 27, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 27, 2023 | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION | ||
November 27, 2023 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
November 27, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmations |
||
November 27, 2023 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
August 22, 2023 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.