Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Alyssa M Paulsen Trustees Of The Paulsen Family Revocable Trust, Matthew K Paulsen Trustees Of The Paulsen Family Revocable Trust, Ryan N Paulsen Trustees Of The Paulsen Family Revocable Trust, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Caponera, Victor Albert, against Board Of Assessment Review Board Of Assessment Review, David Martucci Assessor Of The Town Of Hague New York, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NY, . Warren County, NY Superior Courts with Robert J Muller presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 11, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationWarren County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 17, 2024ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 12, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 12, 2024AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 18, 2024NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 18, 2024STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 19, 2023PETITION
Date: July 11, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: July 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 17, 2023RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: July 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 18, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 31, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: July 19, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 27, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: October 18, 2023REQUEST FOR PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE (COMPLIANCE PART)
Date: September 07, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: September 22, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
January 18, 2024 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 17, 2024 |
ORDER - OTHER Consent Order and Judgment |
||
January 12, 2024 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
January 12, 2024 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 19, 2023 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
October 18, 2023 | STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
September 22, 2023 |
STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation and Order blank form |
||
September 22, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
September 07, 2023 | REQUEST FOR PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE (COMPLIANCE PART) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.