Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Grigg, Natalie Ann, Mullen, Richard S, against Carol H Strasser, Gary Strasser Nka Sally Strasser Aka Gary Y. Strasser, John Doe, Linda Eckstein, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NY, . Warren County, NY Superior Courts with Robert J Muller presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWarren County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: December 21, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: December 21, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: November 15, 2023RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: November 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2023EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 29, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 30, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: June 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A/B A/B Doc copies Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 30, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: June 30, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 25, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: August 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2023 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
December 21, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 15, 2023 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
November 15, 2023 | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION | ||
November 15, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
November 15, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Notice of Pendency, Summons and Complaint |
||
November 15, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Affidavit of Due Dilligence |
||
November 15, 2023 |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) Filed by KAK - 106211 |
||
November 15, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Supplemental Summons |
||
August 29, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.