Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Christine Noel Marquart, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Fish, Nicole Catherine, against Benjamin Vern Marquart, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NY, . Warren County, NY Superior Courts with Paulette M. Kershko presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaulette M. Kershko Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2022 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedJanuary 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWarren County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2022 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
October 21, 2022 | UCS - 111 | ||
October 21, 2022 | QUALIFIED MEDICAL CHILD SUPPORT ORDER | ||
October 21, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
October 21, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
October 05, 2022 | QUALIFIED MEDICAL CHILD SUPPORT ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
August 16, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
July 22, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
July 05, 2022 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
July 05, 2022 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.