Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Burton Rice, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Harwick, John F, against Blackstone Financial Llc, represented by Griffin, Aaron Matthew, Tang, David Ming-Teh, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NY, . Warren County, NY Superior Courts with Martin D Auffredou presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Judgment) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWarren County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 06, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: January 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 06, 2022RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 06, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 10, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: January 06, 2022ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2022ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: January 12, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 06, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: March 16, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 21, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 21, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: January 26, 2022SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: October 26, 2022ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: January 06, 2022SUMMONS
Date: January 06, 2022EXECUTION
Date: November 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 06, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 10, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 29, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
November 29, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
November 28, 2022 | EXECUTION | ||
October 26, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
March 16, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
February 17, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 26, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
January 21, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT scheduling settlement conf for 1-27-22 |
||
January 21, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 20, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.