Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jodi Alice Arbuckle, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Judd, Karen Lynn, against Scott Leon Arbuckle, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NY, . Warren County, NY Superior Courts with Paulette M. Kershko presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWarren County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2021 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
November 22, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
November 22, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
November 12, 2021 | PART 130 CERTIFICATION | ||
November 05, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
November 05, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW (PROPOSED) | ||
November 05, 2021 | AFFIRMATION (AFFIDAVIT) OF REGULARITY | ||
October 28, 2021 | RJI -RE: UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL ACTION | ||
October 28, 2021 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
October 28, 2021 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.