Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Murphy Burns Llp, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Burns, James Joseph, against Mcavinney Builders Llc, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NY, . Warren County, NY Superior Courts Warren County Supreme Court with Robert J Muller presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 06, 2019 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Summary Judgment In Lieu) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions77 days |
Filing LocationWarren County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseWarren County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time77 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN LIEU OF COMPLAINT (Motion #1)
Date: June 06, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 06, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1)
Date: August 12, 2019ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #1)
Date: August 12, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: August 22, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event | BILL OF COSTS | |
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | |
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event | BILL OF COSTS | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1) | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #1) | |
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) | |
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN LIEU OF COMPLAINT (Motion #1) | |
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | |
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Notice to Arbitrate Affidavit of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.