Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Glens Falls Hospital, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Donovan, Linda L, against Michael L Granger, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NY, . Warren County, NY Superior Courts with Martin D Auffredou presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMartin D Auffredou Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWarren County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 19, 2021EXECUTION
Date: April 13, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 07, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 09, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: February 08, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 07, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: February 09, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: February 23, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: February 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1) Defendant's Answer Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 09, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: January 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1) Itemized statements and consent forms Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 07, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 07, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 18, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2022 | EXECUTION | ||
February 23, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
February 22, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
February 09, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
February 09, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
February 09, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
February 08, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
January 18, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
January 13, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 07, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.